Global Patent Index - EP 0887453 B1

EP 0887453 B1 2001-12-12 - Apparatus and method for positioning textile articles

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for positioning textile articles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Positionieren von Textilartikeln

Title (fr)

Appareillage et procédé pour le positionnement de produits manufacturés textiles

Publication

EP 0887453 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98830301 A

Priority

IT FI970150 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887453A1] The fittings position textile hose products to a datum mark. The fittings comprise a structure (1) which has two pairs of cylindrical rollers (4). These lie parallel, one above the other, rotating on their longitudinal axes. The product is placed on them. The rollers are controlled by photodetectors (7) to detect a longitudinal datum on the product. This also controls momentary compressive adhesion of the corresponding fabric portion during pickup, at the surface of the fixed object (44) between each pair of rollers, by associated padded pistons (70). Also claimed is the method of positioning the hose (5) by rotating each product (5) around its own longitudinal axis, to locate a datum mark in correspondence with the reading axis of one or more photodetectors. Rotation is achieved by drawing the fabric inside the product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41B 11/14 (2006.01); D05B 23/00 (2006.01); D06C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 23/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887453 A1 19981230; EP 0887453 B1 20011212; DE 69802870 D1 20020124; DE 69802870 T2 20020814; IT 1293129 B1 19990211; IT FI970150 A1 19981223; IT FI970150 D0 19970623; JP H1112917 A 19990119; US 6132166 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160518

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150514

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090518

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090518

2009-01-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802870 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001030

1999-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990309

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI