Global Patent Index - EP 0887468 B1

EP 0887468 B1 2002-09-18 - Motor-sweeper

Title (en)

Motor-sweeper

Title (de)

Motorisierte Kehrmaschine

Title (fr)

Balayeuse à moteur

Publication

EP 0887468 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98110275 A

Priority

IT PN970038 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887468A2] Motor-sweeper with a horizontally rotating brush roller (3) in contact with the floor to collect the dirt therefrom and send it into a collecting bin (5) through a conveying channel (6, 7). The brush roller (3) is hinged on a lever (11) that is adapted to be actuated by an actuator (20) to vary the position of the brush roller in a direction (A) that is substantially inclined downwards frontally. Control means (17) detect the operating pressure of the brush roller (3) with respect to the floor (4), compare such a pressure with a reference value, and drive the actuator (20) so as to keep both the operating pressure of the brush roller (3) and the cross-section area of said channel (6, 7) constant. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 1/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/056 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

FR 2506360 A1 19821126 - WIEDENMANN GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887468 A2 19981230; EP 0887468 A3 20000315; EP 0887468 B1 20020918; DE 69807994 D1 20021024; DE 69807994 T2 20030130; ES 2184171 T3 20030401; IT 1294137 B1 19990322; IT PN970038 A1 19981228; IT PN970038 D0 19970625

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140606

2015-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150729

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140605

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140605

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807994

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140605

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807994

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130607

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120615

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184171 T3

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807994 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAINARDI, GINO

2002-04-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CREMONESI, ANGELO

2002-04-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GORRA, ALBERTO

2002-04-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BASSANINI, PAOLO

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010828

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NILFISK ADVANCED A/S

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI