Global Patent Index - EP 0887474 B1

EP 0887474 B1 2002-09-04 - Cable operated excavating bucket

Title (en)

Cable operated excavating bucket

Title (de)

Seilbetätigter Schlitzwandgreifer

Title (fr)

Benne d'excavation à câbles

Publication

EP 0887474 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401579 A

Priority

FR 9707925 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887474A2] The bucket comprises a skirt (1) to which clam shells (4,5) are pivoted, and an opening/closing mechanism (8,9,11-18b) operated by cables (2,3), with shutters (19,20) to regulate the attitude of the bin by interacting with the surface of the excavation. The skirt also contains a power generator (34) in the form of a hydraulic pump and cylinder, and a drive to operate it actuated by the clam shell opening and closing mechanism. The power generator is connected to the shutter control system (25,26), and the opening/closing mechanism has a carriage (14) for a block and tackle system operated by a motor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/40; E02F 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/20 (2006.01); E02F 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/26 (2013.01); E02F 3/475 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887474 A2 19981230; EP 0887474 A3 19990804; EP 0887474 B1 20020904; AT 223540 T 20020915; DE 69807599 D1 20021010; DE 69807599 T2 20030424; ES 2183299 T3 20030316; FR 2765257 A1 19981231; FR 2765257 B1 19990903

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050627

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050625

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050627

2005-06-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050625

2005-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050625

2005-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050625

2004-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040629

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040618

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040609

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183299 T3

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807599 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223540 T 20020915

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011219

2000-04-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990916

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6E 02F 3/40 A, 6E 02F 3/26 B

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI