Global Patent Index - EP 0887495 B1

EP 0887495 B1 2001-12-19 - Coupling system for electronic locking devices

Title (en)

Coupling system for electronic locking devices

Title (de)

Koppelsystem für elektronische Verschlusseinrichtungen

Title (fr)

Système d'accouplement pour dispositifs de fermeture électroniques

Publication

EP 0887495 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98111447 A

Priority

DE 19727422 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19727422C1] The electronically controlled coupling system is used between a rotary drive element (1) and a rotary driven element (2) of a lock mechanism, positioned along a common axis. One of the rotary elements is provided with a spring-loaded pin (7), cooperating with a cam surface (9) provided by the other rotary element, to provide a rotational coupling between them, upon linear displacement of one of the rotary elements (2) into a defined axial position, via an electronically-controlled operating drive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/068 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 2015/0448 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19727422 C1 19980625; EP 0887495 A1 19981230; EP 0887495 B1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140622

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140622

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-11-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101021 AND 20101027

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010313

1999-10-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990527

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI