Global Patent Index - EP 0887501 B1

EP 0887501 B1 2001-12-19 - Hidden fitting for windows, doors or the like

Title (en)

Hidden fitting for windows, doors or the like

Title (de)

Verdeckt angeordneter Beschlag für Fenster, Türen oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Ferrure arrangée en feuillure pour fenêtre, porte ou similaire

Publication

EP 0887501 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98110640 A

Priority

  • DE 19726845 A
  • DE 19804355 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887501A2] The guide element (12) fixed to the casement or leaf (2) and engaging with the guide (14) on the blind frame is shaped like a bent pin or rail. The guide element is mounted on the casement or leaf near the rabbet pointing towards the room side by means of a fixture plate. The guide has a guide slot (18) for containing the guide element and is inserted laterally into the frame (1) in the form of a cylinder or cube. The guide element has a base part (12a) on which a part-circular part (12b) is fixed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 1/04; E05D 15/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 1/04 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887501 A2 19981230; EP 0887501 A3 19990324; EP 0887501 B1 20011219; AT 211213 T 20020115; DE 29823616 U1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-04 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180609

2018-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-06-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59802502

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYERWALD - FENSTER HAUSTUEREN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BAYERWALD FENSTER-TUEREN ALTENBUCHINGER GMBH & CO. KG, 94154 NEUKIRCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59802502

2015-09-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802502

- Representative's name: ISARPATENT PATENTANWAELTE BEHNISCH, BARTH, CHA, DE

2015-09-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802502

- Representative's name: ISARPATENT - PATENTANWAELTE- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802502 20020131

2002-01-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011220

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211213 T 20020115

1999-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE GB LI

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990618

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990415

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI