Global patent index - EP 0887595 A3

EP 0887595 A3 2000-07-12 - Automatic venting device for evacuated-tube steam heating systems

Title (en)

Automatic venting device for evacuated-tube steam heating systems

Title (de)

Selbsttätiges Lüftungssystem für Niederdruckdampfheizanlage

Title (fr)

Système d'aération automatique pour système de chauffage à vapeur évaquée

Publication

EP 0887595 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98111204 A

Priority

IT PD970140 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887595A2] An automatic venting device for heating systems comprising one or more heat exchange elements which are individually or globally connected to a heated vessel which contains a substance having convective properties and is associated with heating means which are suitable to cause its evaporation, the condensate of the steam produced by the evaporation collecting directly, by natural or mechanical means, in the heated vessel. The device comprises a closed container (24) which is connected to one or more regions of the heat exchange elements and is provided with sensors (25, 26) which are suitable to detect the presence of air and with an automatic vent valve (27). The sensors and the valve are connected to a control and management unit (28) which receives signals from the sensors and opens and closes the valve (27). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/08; F24D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 1/00 (2006.01); F24D 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 1/00 (2013.01); F24D 19/081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887595 A2 19981230; EP 0887595 A3 20000712; IT 1293721 B1 19990310; IT PD970140 A1 19981228; IT PD970140 D0 19970626

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-08-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: HEATING SYSTEM COMPRISING AN AUTOMATIC VENTING DEVICE

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020911

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IE NL SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IE NL SE

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI