Global Patent Index - EP 0887615 A3

EP 0887615 A3 2000-03-22 - Spin stabilised projectile

Title (en)

Spin stabilised projectile

Title (de)

Drallgeschoss

Title (fr)

Projectile stabilisé par rotation

Publication

EP 0887615 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98110661 A

Priority

DE 29710983 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887615A2] The revolving projectile incorporates a fragmentation shell, a rear guide strip (3) and a front guide ring (4). The diameter (18) of the front guide ring is slightly smaller than that of the rear guide strip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/22; F42B 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/22 (2006.01); F42B 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/02 (2013.01); F42B 12/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29710983 U1 19981022; EP 0887615 A2 19981230; EP 0887615 A3 20000322; EP 0887615 B1 20031008

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050610

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-06-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050610

2005-06-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050610

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040118

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809840 P 20031113

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO. KG

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020515

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI