Global patent index - EP 0887781 A3

EP 0887781 A3 2000-05-03 - Interactive travel information system

Title (en)

Interactive travel information system

Title (de)

Interaktives Reiseinformationssystem

Title (fr)

Système interactif d'information de parcours

Publication

EP 0887781 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98305057 A

Priority

GB 9713622 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887781A2] A communication system (fig 1) for relaying transportation information to a user; the system comprising a database representative of a transportation network, with problem points being input into the transportation network database with a user being able to select a route within the network and to enquire about any problem points on the selected route through the network, it being possible to determine if a problem is present on the selected route, any such problem being verbally communicated to the user. The system may also determine if a problem is relevant to a user based on an estimated position of the user on a selected route of the user. The problem may be communicated via a telecommunications or telephone system such as a mobile or fixed telephone line. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096811 (2013.01); G08G 1/096838 (2013.01); G08G 1/096872 (2013.01); G08G 1/096883 (2013.01); G08G 1/096888 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0887781 A2 19981230; EP 0887781 A3 20000503; GB 2326751 A 19981230; GB 9713622 D0 19970903; GB 9813697 D0 19980826

INPADOC legal status

2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001103

2001-02-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI