Global Patent Index - EP 0887785 A3

EP 0887785 A3 2000-03-29 - Controlling the gray scale of plasma display devices

Title (en)

Controlling the gray scale of plasma display devices

Title (de)

Graustufensteuerung für Plasma-Anzeigevorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Commande d'échelle de gris pour des dispositifs d'affichage à plasma

Publication

EP 0887785 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98203252 A

Priority

  • EP 94300695 A
  • JP 28834593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0653740A2] A method of controlling the gray scale of a plasma display device has a forming step of forming a frame for an image by a plurality of subframes each having a different brightness, a setting step of setting the number of sustain emissions of the each subframe individually for each subframe, and a displaying step of displaying the image on the plasma display device by a gray scale display having a specific brightness. The number of sustain emissions in each subframe is set individually by the individual subframe, and this can establish a linear relation between the gray level and the corresponding brightness. Therefore, an enhancement of display quality of the plasma display device can be realized. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/28 (2013.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/288 (2013.01); G09G 3/291 (2013.01); G09G 3/294 (2013.01); G09G 3/298 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2029 (2013.01); G09G 3/2932 (2013.01); G09G 3/2935 (2013.01); G09G 3/2946 (2013.01); G09G 3/298 (2013.01); G09G 3/2927 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0228 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0276 (2013.01); G09G 2320/046 (2013.01); G09G 2330/02 (2013.01); G09G 2330/021 (2013.01); G09G 2360/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DXA] EP 0488891 A2 19920603 - FUJITSU LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0653740 A2 19950517; EP 0653740 A3 19960626; EP 0653740 B1 20000426; DE 69424122 D1 20000531; DE 69424122 T2 20010201; DE 69431681 D1 20021212; DE 69431681 T2 20030313; EP 0887785 A2 19981230; EP 0887785 A3 20000329; EP 0887785 B1 20021106; JP 2856241 B2 19990210; JP H07140928 A 19950602; KR 970000911 B1 19970121

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140130

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-02-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140130

2014-02-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69431681

2013-06-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130523 AND 20130529

2013-06-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: HITACHI CONSUMER ELECTRONICS CO. LTD., JP

- Effective date: 20130503

2013-05-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI CONSUMER ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI PLASMA PATENT LICENSING CO., LTD., TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 69431681

- Effective date: 20130328

2013-05-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69431681

- Representative's name: SEEGER SEEGER LINDNER PARTNERSCHAFT PATENTANWA, DE

- Effective date: 20130328

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130204

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-08-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-08-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-03-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-04-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-12-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69431681 20021212

2002-11-06 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 653740

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-30 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 653740

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB