Global patent index - EP 0887814 A3

EP 0887814 A3 2000-03-22 - Circuit for controlling a bistable magnetic actuator

Title (en)

Circuit for controlling a bistable magnetic actuator

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zur Steuerung eines bistabilen magnetischen Aktuators

Title (fr)

Circuit de commande d'un actionneur magnétique bistable

Publication

EP 0887814 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98110117 A

Priority

DE 19726562 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0887814A2] The control circuit has a pair of electrical windings (L1,L2) which are each connected in series with a respective semiconductor switch (S1,S2) connected in parallel with closure of one or other switch for switching the magnetic actuator between its stable positions. A further parallel arm with a free-running diode (D) and a cancellation resistance (R) is connected in parallel with the electrical windings, all 3 parallel arms connected in series with a discharge switch (So) for an energy store (E).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/18; H01H 47/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/18 (2006.01); H01H 47/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/226 (2013.01); H01F 7/1872 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726562 A1 19981224; EP 0887814 A2 19981230; EP 0887814 A3 20000322; EP 0887814 B1 20040421

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811215

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01F 7/18 A, 7H 01H 47/22 B

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI