Global Patent Index - EP 0888041 B1

EP 0888041 B1 2000-07-05 - Electronic device comprising a printed board and a receptacle connector with a center contact connected to the board

Title (en)

Electronic device comprising a printed board and a receptacle connector with a center contact connected to the board

Title (de)

Elektronisches Gerät mit einer Leiterplatte und einer Aufnahmeverbindung deren zentraler Verbinder mit der Leiterplatte elektrisch verbunden ist

Title (fr)

Appareil électronique comprenant une plaquette imprimée et un connecteur électronique avec un contact central connecté électriquement avec la plaquette

Publication

EP 0888041 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98303890 A

Priority

JP 16682697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888041A1] An electronic device with a receptacle connector, including a frame member (1) provided with a shell; a printed board (3) with a solder land (3a); and a center contact (26) with a tabular contact terminal. A through hole (lc) is formed in the shell so as to extend through the frame member, and the printed board is disposed within the frame member. The center contact is press-fitted to the through hole in order to make the contact terminal protrude within the frame member such that the tabular surface of the contact terminal is positioned substantially perpendicular to the solder land. When the contact terminal of the center contact of the receptacle connector is soldered onto the printed board, in order to widen the soldering area, it is desirable that the land surface of the solder land and the opposing tabular surface be set perpendicular to each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05K 9/00; H01P 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0888041 A1 19981230; EP 0888041 B1 20000705; DE 69800199 D1 20000810; DE 69800199 T2 20001214; JP H1116641 A 19990122; TW 420970 B 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030518

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-05-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030518

2002-07-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020727

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020530

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020524

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800199 20000810

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990826

1999-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981118

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI