Global patent index - EP 0888141 A4

EP 0888141 A4 2001-01-17 - FILM-FORMING COMPOSITIONS OF ANTIHYPERALGESIC OPIATES AND METHOD OF TREATING HYPERALGESIC CONDITIONS THEREWITH

Title (en)

FILM-FORMING COMPOSITIONS OF ANTIHYPERALGESIC OPIATES AND METHOD OF TREATING HYPERALGESIC CONDITIONS THEREWITH

Title (de)

FILMBILDENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON ANTIHYPERALGESISCHEN OPIATEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERALGESIE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS FILMOGENES D'OPIACES ANTIHYPERALGESIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS UNE METHODE DE TRAITEMENT D'ETATS HYPERALGESIQUES

Publication

EP 0888141 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97907990 A

Priority

  • US 9703315 W
  • US 61402796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5667773A] Topical anti-hyperalgesic film-forming compositions and methods of using compositions for the treatment of peripheral hyperalgesia comprising: a) a compound of the formula <IMAGE> I wherein M isAr2 are as defined in the specification; b) a film-forming polymeric material containing the hyperalgesic compound; and c) an aqueous pharmaceutically acceptable carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 25/00; A61K 47/30; A61K 47/38; A61L 26/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/70 (2006.01); A61L 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 26/0076 (2013.01); A61K 9/7015 (2013.01); A61L 26/0066 (2013.01); A61L 2300/204 (2013.01); A61L 2300/402 (2013.01); Y10S 514/817 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5667773 A 19970916; AU 1984797 A 19971001; AU 715912 B2 20000210; CA 2223514 A1 19970918; CA 2223514 C 20041026; DE 69729284 D1 20040701; DE 69729284 T2 20050616; EP 0888141 A1 19990107; EP 0888141 A4 20010117; EP 0888141 B1 20040526; WO 9733634 A1 19970918

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050226

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-02-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050226

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69729284

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 47/30 A

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 47/38 B

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61L 26/00 B

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 29/00 B

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61L 25/00 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 47/30 B

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 47/38 B

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61L 26/00 B

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 29/00 B

2004-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: FILM-FORMING COMPOSITIONS OF ANTIHYPERALGESIC OPIATES AND THEIR USE FOR TREATING HYPERALGESIC CONDITIONS THEREWITH

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61L 25/00 A

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 47/30 B

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 47/38 B

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61L 26/00 B

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 29/00 B

2003-10-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: FILM-FORMING COMPOSITIONS OF ANTIHYPERALGESIC OPIATES AND THEIR USE FOR TREATING HYPERALGESIC CONDITIONS THEREWITH

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021017

2001-01-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61L 25/00 A, 7A 61K 47/30 B, 7A 61K 47/38 B, 7A 61L 26/00 B

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980910

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB