Global Patent Index - EP 0888152 B1

EP 0888152 B1 2001-02-21 - FIRE-EXTINGUISHING DEVICE AND VALVE FOR USE IN THE DEVICE

Title (en)

FIRE-EXTINGUISHING DEVICE AND VALVE FOR USE IN THE DEVICE

Title (de)

FEUERLÖSCHVORRICHTUNG UND FEUERLÖSCHERVENTIL

Title (fr)

EXTINCTEUR ET SOUPAPE D'EXTINCTEUR APPROPRIEE

Publication

EP 0888152 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97914217 A

Priority

  • EP 9701217 W
  • LU 88729 A
  • LU 88757 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9734659A1] The fire-extinguishing device proposed includes a container (12), holding a gas under pressure, and a fusible hollow element (48) designed to actuate the device. The fusible hollow element (48) is connected to the extinguishant container (12) in such a way that it is acted on by the compressed gas in the container . A pressure regulator (42) is fitted between the extinguishant container (12) and the fusible hollow element (48). The pressure regulator (42) enables the device to be operated using CO2 for instance as the extinguishant, even in situations in which the ambient temperature varies widely. The fusible hollow element (48) can also be designed as a feed line for the extinguishant. Also proposed is a valve for a fire-extinguishing device of this kind.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 35/68; A62C 35/00; A62C 37/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 35/68 (2006.01); A62C 37/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 35/68 (2013.01); A62C 37/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9734659 A1 19970925; AU 2155097 A 19971010; AU 710517 B2 19990923; CN 1104918 C 20030409; CN 1213324 A 19990407; DE 19780225 D2 20000210; DE 59703016 D1 20010329; EP 0888152 A1 19990107; EP 0888152 B1 20010221; ES 2156371 T3 20010616

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170311

2017-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170626

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170309

2017-03-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170309

2017-03-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59703016

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156371 T3

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010427

2001-05-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BIANCHETTI - BRACCO - MINOJA S.R.L.

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703016 20010329

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000317

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980822

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT