Global Patent Index - EP 0888192 B1

EP 0888192 B1 2001-05-30 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY AND CONTINUOUSLY PRODUCING A PLURALITY OF SIZE FRACTIONS OF A MINERAL MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY AND CONTINUOUSLY PRODUCING A PLURALITY OF SIZE FRACTIONS OF A MINERAL MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE FÜR DIE GLEICHZEITIGE UND KONTINUIERLICHE HERSTELLUNG MEHRERER GRANULATFRAKTIONEN EINES MINERALISCHEN MATERIALS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION POUR LA PRODUCTION SIMULTANEE ET EN CONTINU DE PLUSIEURS FRACTIONS GRANULOMETRIQUES D'UNE MATIERE MINERALE

Publication

EP 0888192 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97915524 A

Priority

  • FR 9700492 W
  • FR 9603577 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9735665A1] A method and a continuously operating apparatus for grinding a mineral material into grains of different sizes and sorting the ground material into a plurality of fractions that each consist of grains with a size smaller than a maximum value and greater than a minimum value. The starting material is ground by crushing into a material layer, the ground material is divided into a plurality of fractions, including at least one coarse fraction and at least one fine fraction, and grains with a size greater than a maximum value for the coarse fraction are fed back into the grinding apparatus, optionally along with all or part of the fractions of which the grains have a size between the minimum value for the coarse fraction and the maximum value for the fine fraction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 23/14; B02C 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 21/00 (2006.01); B02C 23/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 23/14 (2013.01); B02C 21/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9735665 A1 19971002; AT 201616 T 20010615; AU 2296797 A 19971017; AU 726956 B2 20001130; BR 9708237 A 19990803; CA 2248249 A1 19971002; DE 69705034 D1 20010705; DE 69705034 T2 20020214; EP 0888192 A1 19990107; EP 0888192 B1 20010530; FR 2746329 A1 19970926; FR 2746329 B1 19980522; HR P970167 A2 19980430; NO 984395 A 19981119; NO 984395 D0 19980921; US 6042032 A 20000328; ZA 9702440 B 19980727

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-25 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2003-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-02-26 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *F C B

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020327

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020306

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: F C B ALUMINIUM

2001-09-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KRUPP POLYSIUS AG

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-08-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: F C B ALUMINIUM

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69705034 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19980907

2001-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201616 T 20010615

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PINONCELY, ANDRE

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990702

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980907

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 980907