Global Patent Index - EP 0888222 B1

EP 0888222 B1 2002-09-04 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RENDERING AN ELECTROCOAGULATION IMAGE WATER-FAST

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RENDERING AN ELECTROCOAGULATION IMAGE WATER-FAST

Title (de)

METHODE UND APPARAT ZUM WASSERFESTMACHEN VON ELEKTROKOAGULIERTEN BILDERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A RENDRE UNE IMAGE OBTENUE PAR ELECTROCOAGULATION RESISTANTE A L'EAU

Publication

EP 0888222 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97950434 A

Priority

  • CA 2194129 A
  • JP 9704902 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2194129A1] An improved electrocoagulation printing method comprising the steps of (a) providing a positive electrolytically inert electrode having a continuous passivated surface moving at substantially constant speed along a predetermined path, the passivated surface defining a positive electrode active surface; (b) forming on the positive electrode active surface a plurality of dots of colored, coagulated colloid representative of a desired image, by electrocoagulation of an electrolytically coagulable colloid present in an electrocoagulation printing ink comprising a liquid colloidal dispersion containing said electrolytically coagulable colloid, a dispersing medium, a soluble electrolyte and a coloring agent; and (c) bringing a substrate into contact with the dots of colored, coagulated colloid to cause transfer of the colored, coagulated colloid from the positive electrode active surface onto the substrate and thereby imprint the substrate with the image. The improvement resides in treating the dots of colored, coagulated colloid transferred onto the substrate in step (c) with a crosslinking agent so as to substantially completely crosslink the colored, coagulated colloid and thereby render the printed image water-fast.

[origin: CA2194129A1] An improved electrocoagulation printing method comprising the steps of (a) providing a positive electrolytically inert electrode having a continuous passivated surface moving at substantially constant speed along a predetermined path, the passivated surface defining a positive electrode active surface; (b) forming on the positive electrode active surface a plurality of dots of colored, coagulated colloid representative of a desired image, by electrocoagulation of an electrolytically coagulable colloid present in an electrocoagulation printing ink comprising a liquid colloidal dispersion containing said electrolytically coagulable colloid, a dispersing medium, a soluble electrolyte and a coloring agent; and (c) bringing a substrate into contact with the dots of colored, coagulated colloid to cause transfer of the colored, coagulated colloid from the positive electrode active surface onto the substrate and thereby imprint the substrate with the image. The improvement resides in treating the dots of colored, coagulated colloid transferred onto the substrate in step (c) with a crosslinking agent so as to substantially completely crosslink the colored, coagulated colloid and thereby render the printed image water-fast.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/20; B41M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/39 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/20 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/105 (2013.01); B41M 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

CA 2194129 A1 19980630; CA 2194129 C 20010227; DE 69715169 D1 20021010; DE 69715169 T2 20031023; EP 0888222 A1 19990107; EP 0888222 B1 20020904; JP 2000507177 A 20000613; WO 9829256 A1 19980709

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051226

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041226

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-12-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041226

2004-01-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715169 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991214

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980826

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT