Global patent index - EP 0888225 B1

EP 0888225 B1 2000-05-10 - TRANSFER LABEL

Title (en)

TRANSFER LABEL

Title (de)

TRANSFERETIKETT

Title (fr)

ETIQUETTE IMPRIMEE PAR TRANSFERT

Publication

EP 0888225 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97903262 A

Priority

  • DE 29602430 U
  • EP 9700642 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9728974A1] The invention concerns a transfer label comprising: a carrier material layer (1); a printing layer (5) which is detachably disposed on the carrier material layer (1) and can be affixed to an object by adhesive (7); and a protective layer (3) which is disposed between the carrier material layer (1) and the printing layer (5) and can be detached from the carrier material layer (1). The protective layer takes the form of a substantially non-plasticizeable protective film (3) which sticks directly to the carrier material layer (1) by adhesion yet can be detached substantially independently of the label temperature and is made of a completely polymerized material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44C 1/17; B41M 3/12; G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/12 (2006.01); B44C 1/17 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2013.01); B44C 1/172 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29602430 U1 19970703; EP 0888225 A1 19990107; EP 0888225 B1 20000510; ES 2146979 T3 20000816; HK 1015325 A1 20001020; WO 9728974 A1 19970814

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-09-07 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-09-07 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20050711

2005-02-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050212

2004-02-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: FRANZ BARTA KG

2001-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: HEINEKEN TECHNICAL SERVICES B.V.

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: FRANZ BARTA KG

2001-04-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FRANZ BARTA KG

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-04-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HEINEKEN TECHNICAL SERVICES B.V.

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FRANZ BARTA KG

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146979

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701652

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

1999-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEINBEIS PPL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990423

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980806

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL