Global patent index - EP 0888375 A4

EP 0888375 A4 2001-04-11 - A NOVEL DISINTEGRIN METALLOPROTEASE AND METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

A NOVEL DISINTEGRIN METALLOPROTEASE AND METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

NEUE DISINTEGRIN METALLPROTEASE UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

NOUVELLE DISINTEGRINE-METALLOPROTEASE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0888375 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97908799 A

Priority

  • US 9703217 W
  • US 1267996 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9731931A1] This invention provides a method for identifying compounds capable of binding to the disintegrin protein, and determining the amount and affinity of a compound capable of binding to the disintegrin protein in a sample. This invention also provides a host cell comprising a recombinant expression vector to the disintegrin protein and a recombinant expression vector encoding to the disintegrin protein and the human disintegrin metalloprotease protein, fragment or mutant thereof, useful for these purposes. This invention also provides an in vivo or in vitro method for screening for osteoarthritis and other metalloprotease based diseases, capable of manufacture and use in a kit form.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/02; A61K 38/00; A61K 39/395; C07K 14/435; C12N 5/16; C12N 15/63; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 49/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/40 (2006.01); C12N 9/50 (2006.01); C12N 9/64 (2006.01); C12N 15/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 33/573 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/6489 (2013.01); G01N 33/573 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); G01N 2333/96486 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9808933 A1 19980305 - UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al
  • [X] CHANTRY A ET AL: "A NOVEL METALLOPROTEINASE ASSOCIATED WITH BRAIN MYELIN MEMBRANES ISOLATION AND CHARACTERIZATION", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 264, no. 36, 1989, pages 21603 - 21607, XP002158712, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [PX] HOWARD L ET AL: "MOLECULAR CLONING OF MADM: A CATALYTICALLY ACTIVE MAMMALIAN", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL,GB,PORTLAND PRESS, LONDON, vol. 317, no. 1, 1 July 1996 (1996-07-01), pages 45 - 50, XP002046451, ISSN: 0264-6021
  • See also references of WO 9731931A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9731931 A1 19970904; AU 2061797 A 19970916; CA 2247827 A1 19970904; EP 0888375 A1 19990107; EP 0888375 A4 20010411; JP H11506023 A 19990602; NO 983984 A 19981102; NO 983984 D0 19980828; NZ 331844 A 20000623

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020629

2001-04-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010223

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980925

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE