Global Patent Index - EP 0888450 B1

EP 0888450 B1 2000-05-24 - ADDITIVE FOR A WASHING OR CLEANING AGENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID ADDITIVE

Title (en)

ADDITIVE FOR A WASHING OR CLEANING AGENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID ADDITIVE

Title (de)

WASCH- ODER REINIGUNGSMITTELADDITIV SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

ADDITIF POUR PRODUITS DE LAVAGE OU DE NETTOYAGE, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 0888450 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97933648 A

Priority

  • DE 19627427 A
  • DE 19632284 A
  • EP 9703468 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9801531A2] The invention concerns additives with an apparent density of 500 g/l for use in granular washing or cleaning agents with apparent densities of at least 500 g/l, said additives containing one or several anion surfactants and at least one other ingredient that is usually subsequently added when producing washing or cleaning agents, provided that this other ingredient or ingredients is an ingredient chosen from the following; bleach activator, bleach catalyst and premanufactured foam inhibitor. By adding these solid additives to solid base granules, the additives having approximately the same apparent density, granular form and size as the base granules, washing or cleaning agents with greater apparent densities are produced which have a uniform appearance and are not inclined to separate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/06; C11D 3/395; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/065 (2013.01); C11D 11/0082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9801531 A2 19980115; WO 9801531 A3 19980409; AT 193322 T 20000615; EP 0888450 A2 19990107; EP 0888450 B1 20000524; EP 0888450 B2 20030115; ES 2148999 T3 20001016; ES 2148999 T5 20030501; JP H11513074 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-09-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060825

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060703

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-01 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2003-05-14 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2003-05-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2003-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2003-03-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-15 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2002-01-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20010223

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2001-04-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148999

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701763

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193322

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980312

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL