Global Patent Index - EP 0888467 B1

EP 0888467 B1 2000-02-02 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CELLULOSIC FIBRES WITH REDUCED TENDENCY TO FIBRILLATE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CELLULOSIC FIBRES WITH REDUCED TENDENCY TO FIBRILLATE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CELLULOSISCHEN FASERN MIT VERRINGERTER FIBRILLIERUNGSNEIGUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE FIBRES CELLULOSIQUES A TENDANCE REDUITE A LA FIBRILLATION

Publication

EP 0888467 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97915374 A

Priority

  • DE 19611493 A
  • EP 9701322 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9736028A1] The tendency to fibrillate of cellulosic fibres spun from tertiary amine oxide solutions and fibrous products produced from these fibres is reduced by a treatment with heat and a solution containing a tertiary amine oxide and optionally an additive. A heat treatment is sufficient to reduce the tendency of fibres to fibrillate after precipitation and before washing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 2/00; D01F 11/02; D06M 13/388

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 2/00 (2006.01); D01F 11/02 (2006.01); D06M 10/08 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/322 (2006.01); D06M 13/388 (2006.01); D06M 101/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 10/08 (2013.01); D01F 2/00 (2013.01); D01F 11/02 (2013.01); D06M 13/388 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9736028 A1 19971002; AT 189487 T 20000215; AU 2288197 A 19971017; EP 0888467 A1 19990107; EP 0888467 B1 20000202; ID 16295 A 19970918; JP 2000507314 A 20000613; TW 339367 B 19980901

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-03 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 59701089

- Effective date: 20150603

2001-02-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-10 [R18W] WITHDRAWAL (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000129

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-03-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 19990129

2000-03-29 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701089 20000309

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IE IT

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189487 T 20000215

2000-01-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990618

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980916

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IE IT