Global patent index - EP 0888489 A4

EP 0888489 A4 2000-10-18 - HYDROCARBON RECOVERY METHOD USING INVERTED PRODUCTION WELLS

Title (en)

HYDROCARBON RECOVERY METHOD USING INVERTED PRODUCTION WELLS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN MIT HILFE EINER AUFWÄRTS IN DEN TRÄGER GERICHTETEN PRODUKTIONSBOHRUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION D'HYDROCARBURES AU MOYEN DE PUITS DE PRODUCTION INVERSES

Publication

EP 0888489 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96911343 A

Priority

  • CA 2248757 A
  • US 9603718 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9735090A1] A method using an "inverted" production well (20) for recovering hydrocarbons from a subterranean reservoir (11) wherein the production wellbore (20) has a substantially vertical, non-inverted portion (20a) with angle building to near 90 degrees, an integral, substantially horizontal portion (20b) which extends into said reservoir (11); and an integral, upwardly curving tail portion (20c) which terminates near the top of the reservoir (11). A string of production tubing (23) which may include a downhole pump is positioned within the non-inverted portion (20a) of the wellbore (20). The inverted well (20) increases the production interval within the reservoir (11) and reduces bottom-water coning. Further, a plug (25) can be set in the tail portion (20c) to reduce the production of steam through the wellbore (20). In another embodiment of the present invention, a single inverted well (20) may be used both for injecting steam and producing fluids by extending a string of injection tubing (30) through or adjacent to the production tubing (23) and into the tail portion (20c) of the wellbore (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 43/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/06 (2006.01); E21B 36/00 (2006.01); E21B 43/24 (2006.01); E21B 43/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/24 (2013.01); E21B 43/305 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9735090 A1 19970925; CA 2248757 A1 19970925; EP 0888489 A1 19990107; EP 0888489 A4 20001018

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20021015

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020211

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 21B 43/24 A

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981019

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL