Global patent index - EP 0888518 B1

EP 0888518 B1 2000-09-06 - Buffer cell for an apparatus for thermal waste gas treatment, in particular of oxidizable carbonisation gas

Title (en)

Buffer cell for an apparatus for thermal waste gas treatment, in particular of oxidizable carbonisation gas

Title (de)

Pufferzelle für eine Vorrichtung zur thermische Abgasbehandlung, insbesondere von oxidierbaren Schwelgasen

Title (fr)

Réservoir tampon pour un dispositif pour le traitment d'effluents gazeux, en particulier de gaz de carbonisation

Publication

EP 0888518 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97917254 A

Priority

  • DE 9700412 W
  • DE 19611226 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19611226C1] The invention relates to a device for thermal waste gas treatment, in particular of oxidizable low-temperature carbonisation gases. Said device has at least two regenerators (45, 49) each with a heat accumulator (47, 51) and with a heating zone (53) arranged between said regenerators (45, 49). Waste gas to be treated can be supplied to a serial arrangement of at least two regenerators (45, 49) alternately from each side. A buffer cell (3) is provided to which essentially the uncleaned gas volume contained before change-over at the entrance of the relevant regenerator (45, 49), and the gas volume which is only partially cleaned can be conveyed each time the supply of waste gase is shifted to the respective other side of the serial arrangement. The uncleaned gas volume held in the buffer cell (3) after change-over or the gas volume which is only partially cleaned can be supplied completely until the next change-over to the respective other side of the serial arrangement of the regenerators. The invention also relates to a structurally simple embodiment of a buffer cell (3) for use with said device, which also reliably prevents the temperature from falling below dew point inside the buffer container (23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/068 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT LU

EPO simple patent family

DE 19611226 C1 19971002; AT 196191 T 20000915; EP 0888518 A1 19990107; EP 0888518 B1 20000906; WO 9735149 A1 19970925

INPADOC legal status

2002-03-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020305

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010323

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000906

2001-03-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-02-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-10-25 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702315

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-12

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT LU

2000-09-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196191

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990119

2000-02-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BUFFER CELL FOR AN APPARATUS FOR THERMAL WASTE GAS TREATMENT, IN PARTICULAR OF OXIDIZABLE CARBONISATION GAS

2000-01-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BUFFER CELL FOR AN APPARATUS FOR THERMAL WASTE GAS TREATMENT, IN PARTICULAR OF OXIDIZABLE CARBONISATION GAS

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990119

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980917

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT LU