Global Patent Index - EP 0888579 B1

EP 0888579 B1 2003-06-11 - PROCESS AND ARRANGEMENT FOR OPTIMISING CHARGE PATTERN FORMATION ON A PHOTOCONDUCTOR

Title (en)

PROCESS AND ARRANGEMENT FOR OPTIMISING CHARGE PATTERN FORMATION ON A PHOTOCONDUCTOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM OPTIMIEREN EINER LADUNGSBILDERZEUGUNG AUF EINEM FOTOLEITER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR OPTIMISER LA PRODUCTION D'UNE IMAGE ELECTRIQUE SUR UN PHOTOCONDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 0888579 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97920571 A

Priority

  • DE 9700663 W
  • DE 19612637 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9737285A1] The disclosure relates to a process for optimising charge pattern formation. In order to determine (step 3) an optimised exposure energy (H) for a given charging potential (Vc) of a photoconductor, a sensitivity factor (K) is calculated (step 3). In addition, a process is described whereby an optimised charging potential (Vc) is calculated on the basis of the sensitivity factor (K) for a given exposure energy (H).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00; G03G 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/5045 (2013.01); G03G 15/0266 (2013.01); G03G 15/5037 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9737285 A1 19971009; EP 0888579 A1 19990107; EP 0888579 B1 20030611; US 6167210 A 20001226

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710268

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110530

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-06-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-12-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710268 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010913

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980513

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB