Global Patent Index - EP 0888652 B1

EP 0888652 B1 2001-05-16 - ELECTRICAL COUPLER

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL COUPLER

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE COUPLAGE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0888652 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97916347 A

Priority

  • DE 9700526 W
  • DE 19611423 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19611423C1] The invention relates to an electrical coupler with at least one contact (11; 41, 49; 51) which substantially is in the form of a strip and extends from an inner side of a housing through a housing wall (12; 42; 52, 53) to an outer side of said housing where it takes the form of a flat contact (15) extending along an outer wall surface of said housing. Said electrical coupler is characterised in that the housing wall has a recess (14, 17; 44) which starts from the outer side of the housing and uncovers at least parts of the contact section extending through the housing wall. The uncovered contact section is designed at least partially as a second flat contact (16), and the recess takes the form of a plug-in opening for a contact spring (32) which can contact the second flat contact.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 27/00; H01R 13/24; H01R 13/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/26 (2006.01); H01R 13/46 (2006.01); H01R 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/24 (2013.01); H01R 13/26 (2013.01); H01R 27/00 (2013.01); H01R 12/716 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19611423 C1 19970522; EP 0888652 A1 19990107; EP 0888652 B1 20010516; JP 3085988 B2 20000911; JP H11506266 A 19990602; WO 9736350 A1 19971002

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2005-03-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050314

2004-03-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040314

2003-11-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030314

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS A.G.

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-03-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030314

2003-01-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020416

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-01 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020301

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020205

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE FI FR GB IT SE

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990127

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980903

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE FI FR GB IT SE