Global Patent Index - EP 0888655 B1

EP 0888655 B1 2000-05-31 - SPARKING PLUG CONNECTOR FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

SPARKING PLUG CONNECTOR FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

ZÜNDKERZENSTECKER FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR

Title (fr)

COSSE DE BOUGIE D'ALLUMAGE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0888655 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97919259 A

Priority

  • DE 9700459 W
  • DE 19611283 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9736354A1] The invention relates to a sparking plug connector for an internal combustion engine and having a plug-in contact (28) for the electrode connection of a sparking plug, a connector sleeve (3) encasing the plug-in contact (28), a connection (32) for an ignition cable, a single, stiff, carrying connector sleeve (3) consisting of an insulating material, and resilient means (20) fastened to the connector sleeve (3), sealing the gap (22) between the connector sleeve and a plug cavity of an engine cylinder and through which the sparking plug connector extends in the plug cavity. The material of the connector sleeve (3) has a high melting point and a high level of electric strength. The gap between the connector sleeve (3) and the ceramic shank of the sparking plug is sealed by resilient means (17) fastened to the connector sleeve and through which the sparking plug connector extends when mounted on the sparking plug. A ceramic inlet (7) is provided in the connector sleeve (3) and surrounds the plug-in contact (28) and the ignition cable connection (32), said plug-in contact (28) and the ignition cable connection (32) being embedded in the ceramic inlet (7) in such a manner that the ceramic projects axially beyond the plug-in contact (28) and the connection (32) for the ignition cable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DK ES FI GB LI LU PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9736354 A1 19971002; AT 193623 T 20000615; AU 2379497 A 19971017; DE 19611283 C1 19971023; DK 0888655 T3 20001009; EP 0888655 A1 19990107; EP 0888655 B1 20000531; ES 2150768 T3 20001201; NO 984191 A 19980911; NO 984191 D0 19980911; PT 888655 E 20001130; US 6068495 A 20000530

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170307

2017-04-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 193623 T

- Effective date: 20170308

2017-03-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170307

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-10-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060309

2005-04-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050413

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2001-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-03-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-03-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010308

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150768 T3

2000-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-10-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK ES FI GB LI LU PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19981006

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193623 T 20000615

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990506

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981006

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK ES FI GB LI LU PT SE

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 981006