Global Patent Index - EP 0888703 B1

EP 0888703 B1 2000-01-12 - INDUCTION COOKING DEVICE WITH STONE SURFACE FOR USE AS A WORK SURFACE TOP

Title (en)

INDUCTION COOKING DEVICE WITH STONE SURFACE FOR USE AS A WORK SURFACE TOP

Title (de)

INDUKTIONSHERDANORDNUNG MIT STEINOBERFLÄCHE FUR EINE KÜCHENARBEITSPLATTE

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE TABLE DE CUISSON A INDUCTION PRESENTANT UNE SURFACE EN PIERRE SERVANT DE PLAN DE TRAVAIL POUR LA CUISINE

Publication

EP 0888703 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96904806 A

Priority

EP 9600671 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9730567A1] The invention describes a light construction of a stone surface for induction cooktop as well as the simultaneous use of this surface as a robust work surface top. A uniformly flat, sufficiently thin stone plate (1) is laid on an equally flat, reinforcement plate (2) for mechanical stability. Induction coils (3 or 3a) are positioned in or under the reinforcement plate for inductive heating of the cooking pots. This arrangement is additionally stabilized through a frame (4) and a substructure (7) and is closed off at the edge through a border or a trim (8) or embedded in a work surface top (6) surrounding the cooktop.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/06; H05B 6/12; H05B 6/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/1209 (2013.01); Y10S 99/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI MC NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9730567 A1 19970821; AT 188835 T 20000115; AU 4877496 A 19970902; DE 59604200 D1 20000217; EP 0888703 A1 19990107; EP 0888703 B1 20000112; JP 2000504874 A 20000418; US 5973303 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604200

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2005-04-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050405

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2003-02-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030216

2002-01-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KUSE KOLJA

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-07-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: D'AMICO GIULIANA

2000-03-12 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000312

2000-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604200 20000217

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI MC NL

2000-01-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188835 T 20000115

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990223

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980910

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI MC NL