Global Patent Index - EP 0888737 B1

EP 0888737 B1 2002-09-04 - Drawer side walls

Title (en)

Drawer side walls

Title (de)

Schubladenzarge

Title (fr)

Parois latérales de tiroirs

Publication

EP 0888737 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98111131 A

Priority

AT 114497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888737A1] The metal frame or rail has a horizontal support web for a wooden or plastics base plate and provided with several punched-out tabs having upwardly aligned claws (4). The claws are each arranged on the side of the tabs (8) and are likewise aligned in the longitudinal direction of the web. Each tab need only be provided with one claw. The tabs can have on the side opposite the claw at least one lateral zigzag (12,13). The tabs can be bent out of asymmetrical closed slits (9) in the support web (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/04 (2006.01); A47B 88/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/941 (2017.01); A47B 2210/0021 (2013.01); A47B 2210/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0888737 A1 19990107; EP 0888737 B1 20020904; AT 223169 T 20020915; AT 409069 B 20020527; AT A114497 A 20011015; CN 1172617 C 20041027; CN 1204487 A 19990113; DE 59805381 D1 20021010; ES 2183257 T3 20030316; JP 4250772 B2 20090408; JP H1156500 A 19990302; US 6053592 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59805381

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183257 T3

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805381 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223169 T 20020915

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

1999-09-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES IT

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981106

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI