Global patent index - EP 0888739 A3

EP 0888739 A3 2000-05-17 - Chair, particularly office chair

Title (en)

Chair, particularly office chair

Title (de)

Stuhl, insbesondere Bürostuhl

Title (fr)

Chaise, notamment chaise de bureau

Publication

EP 0888739 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112253 A

Priority

DE 19728838 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888739A2] The chair has a seat (1) and backrest (2) tilting rearwards from the rest position under control of a vertical linkage. The latter comprises a seat support (7) joined to a supporting foot and forming a basic link, a seat link (4) above it, and a rear connecting link (6) between them and supporting the backrest. This linkage is spring-loaded into the rest position. The return spring is a torsion one (10) enclosing the hinge spindle (15) between the seat-support (7) and the backrest link (6), or itself forming a spring body. The forward end (13) of the spring body bears against the seat support, while the rear one (9) at least partly forms the spring-loaded backrest link (6). The linkage can be in four parts, with a front link (5) between the basic link and the seat link (4). The spring body can bear against the seat-support.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03238 (2013.01); A47C 1/03255 (2013.01); A47C 1/03261 (2013.01); A47C 1/03266 (2013.01); A47C 1/03272 (2013.01); A47C 1/03277 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29723702 U1 19981224; DE 19728838 C1 19990114; EP 0888739 A2 19990107; EP 0888739 A3 20000517

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20021128

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-07-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SANDER, ARMIN

2002-07-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: POTRYKUS, MARTIN

2001-02-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG + NEURATH AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SANDER, ARMIN

1999-01-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: POTRYKUS, MARTIN

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI