Global Patent Index - EP 0888799 B1

EP 0888799 B1 2001-12-19 - Manual device for lengthening or shortening the nose of a puppet

Title (en)

Manual device for lengthening or shortening the nose of a puppet

Title (de)

Handbetätigbares System zum Verlängern oder Verkürzen der Nase einer Handpuppe

Title (fr)

Système manuel pour allonger ou raccourcir le nez d'une marionnette

Publication

EP 0888799 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98830403 A

Priority

IT FI970156 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888799A1] The head of the puppet (3,3') has a cavity (30) and a long nose (4) moves backwards and forwards through a slot (34) in the head. A rod (5) is fixed to the head and passes through the slot and into a axial cavity (40) in the inner end of the nose. The nose is moved manually by a lever (1) that pivots on a horizontal pivot (2), inside the cavity in the head. One arm (11) of the lever is joined to the base of the nose by a ring (6). The other arm (10) extends beyond the head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 3/36; A63H 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 3/14 (2006.01); A63H 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 3/365 (2013.01); A63H 3/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH ES IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0888799 A1 19990107; EP 0888799 B1 20011219; ES 2169494 T3 20020701; IT 1294809 B1 19990415; IT FI970156 A1 19990104

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140702

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130730

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-08-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169494 T3

2002-03-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH ES IT LI PT

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010315

1999-10-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-09-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH ES IT LI PT

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990615

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH ES IT LI PT

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI