Global Patent Index - EP 0888811 A3

EP 0888811 A3 2000-11-15 - Mixing apparatus

Title (en)

Mixing apparatus

Title (de)

Mischvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mélange

Publication

EP 0888811 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98305267 A

Priority

GB 9713967 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888811A2] Mixing apparatus comprises a container (2) and a mixing mechanism (8) mounted within the container (2), the mechanism (8) including a driven shaft (10) and a mixing disc (22) mounted on said shaft (10) to be movable axially relative to the shaft (10) and so arranged that, on initial rotation of the shaft (10) in one direction, the disc (22) moves from a predetermined upper position on the shaft (10) to a predetermined lower position on the shaft (10) where it remains on continued rotation of the shaft (10) in said one direction, and, on initial rotation of the shaft (10) in the opposite direction, the disc (22) moves from said predetermined lower position on the shaft (10) to said predetermined upper position on the shaft (10) where it remains on continued rotation of the shaft (10) in said opposite direction. Preferably the disc (22) is bladed, co-operating helical means (20,28) reacting between the shaft (10) and the disc (22) to control the axial movement of the disc (22) along the shaft (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/16; B01F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 7/16 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/001 (2013.01); B01F 7/00183 (2013.01); B01F 7/00475 (2013.01); B01F 7/161 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0888811 A2 19990107; EP 0888811 A3 20001115; GB 9713967 D0 19970910

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020711

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI