Global Patent Index - EP 0888823 B1

EP 0888823 B1 2002-11-06 - Dispenser for liquid or pasty material comprising pumping means

Title (en)

Dispenser for liquid or pasty material comprising pumping means

Title (de)

Pumpanordnung enthaltender Spender für pastöses oder flüssiges Material

Title (fr)

Distributeur pour un produit liquide ou pâteux comportant des moyens de pompage ameliorés

Publication

EP 0888823 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401483 A

Priority

FR 9708468 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888823A1] The dispensing head (7) consists of an axially-moving pusher (26), forming a pumping chamber (22) with an intake (14) closed by an inlet valve (16) on a piston (12) which has at least one seal lip (12a, 12b) in contact with the inner walls of the chamber. The piston is able to move between upper and lower positions, first drawing in the product and then expelling it through a dispensing valve (40), while a spring (32) returns the piston to its upper position. The piston seal lips are made from a rigid or semi-rigid material, while its inlet valve (16) comprises a membrane of a supple material. The material used for the membrane is selected, for example, from the group of thermoplastic elastomers comprising propylene/ethylene copolymers, polyether blocamides, polyvinyls, ethylene propylene diene terpolymers (EPDM), sequenced styrene butadiene polymers (SBS), sequenced styrene ethylene butadiene polymers (SEBS-SIS), thermoplastic polyurethanes, or mixtures of polypropylene with SEBS-SIS, EPDM or SBS. The membrane can be made e.g. from natural or synthetic rubber, such as nitrile or polybutadiene rubber. The piston itself is made e.g. from polypropylene, high or low density polyethene, PVC, polyacetal, ethylene vinyl acetates or mixtures of these.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/76 (2006.01); B05B 9/00 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3001 (2013.01); B05B 11/0024 (2013.01); B05B 11/0072 (2013.01); B05B 11/3004 (2013.01); B05B 11/3067 (2013.01); B05B 11/0043 (2013.01); B05B 11/0048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0888823 A1 19990107; EP 0888823 B1 20021106; AR 015922 A1 20010530; CA 2241341 A1 19990102; CA 2241341 C 20031104; CN 1081589 C 20020327; CN 1208711 A 19990224; DE 69809135 D1 20021212; DE 69809135 T2 20030320; ES 2186982 T3 20030516; FR 2765560 A1 19990108; FR 2765560 B1 19990813; JP 3392755 B2 20030331; JP H1176883 A 19990323; US 6070763 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110618

2013-06-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130605

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110617

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809135

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110617

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110617

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100610

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100713

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186982 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809135 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010212

1999-09-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990127

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI