Global Patent Index - EP 0888832 A3

EP 0888832 A3 2000-03-22 - A method of rolling a metal strip and a rolling mill for implementing the method.

Title (en)

A method of rolling a metal strip and a rolling mill for implementing the method.

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Walzen von Metallband und Walzwerk zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour laminer une bande métallique et laminoir pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0888832 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98201796 A

Priority

IT MI971569 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888832A2] A method of rolling a metal strip (5) extending along a path (4) between two housings (2, 3) of a rolling mill (1), which achieves improved uniformity in the thickness of the strip across its width and improved flatness in an unusually easy manner, comprises the step of imposing on the strip (5) a lengthening of the path which differs across the width of the strip. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/28; B21B 39/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/28 (2006.01); B21B 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 39/08 (2013.01); B21B 37/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] DE 19503363 A1 19950907 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [XA] US 3782152 A 19740101 - SABATINI B
  • [XA] GB 1496946 A 19780105 - NIPPON KOKAN KK
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 074 (M - 568) 6 March 1987 (1987-03-06)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 301 (M - 628) 30 September 1987 (1987-09-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 501 (M - 1193) 18 December 1991 (1991-12-18)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0888832 A2 19990107; EP 0888832 A3 20000322; IT 1292458 B1 19990208; IT MI971569 A1 19990104; IT MI971569 D0 19970702

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000923

2001-01-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI