Global Patent Index - EP 0888850 A3

EP 0888850 A3 2000-11-15 - Pliers

Title (en)

Pliers

Title (de)

Zange

Title (fr)

Pince

Publication

EP 0888850 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112178 A

Priority

DE 19728685 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888850A2] The tool (1) has two jaws (2,3) each with a working element (8,9). The jaws are movable relative to each other via parallel guide pegs (12,13) located on one of the jaws. The pegs are formed and positioned, so that in every working position, and when the tool is closed, they project through the other jaw. The jaws are hollow in the area of the working elements. In one working position of the elements, the guide pegs are located in a plane at right angles to the tool plane, and move past the side of the jaws. In another working position, the pegs are located in the tool plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 7/02; B21D 39/04; B25B 7/04; B25B 27/14; H01R 43/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 7/02 (2006.01); B25B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 7/02 (2013.01); B25B 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0888850 A2 19990107; EP 0888850 A3 20001115; EP 0888850 B1 20040609; EP 0888850 B8 20041103; EP 0888850 B8 20041229; DE 19728685 A1 19990107

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-03-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-22 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STORM, SIEGFRIED

2004-10-13 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STORM, SIEGRIED

2004-09-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811530 P 20040715

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010503

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 25B 7/02 A, 7B 25B 7/04 B, 7B 21D 39/04 B, 7B 25B 27/14 B, 7H 01R 43/042 B

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI