Global Patent Index - EP 0888883 A3

EP 0888883 A3 2000-04-05 - Polypropylene composite

Title (en)

Polypropylene composite

Title (de)

Polypropylenverbund

Title (fr)

Composite en polypropylène

Publication

EP 0888883 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112183 A

Priority

DE 29711576 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888883A2] Composite is made of polypropylene and has a polypropylene plate (1) with variable weight per unit area provided with a coating acting as padding, protection, and/or covering, and comprising a fleece (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 27/32; B32B 27/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 27/12 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01); D06N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/4291 (2013.01); B32B 27/12 (2013.01); D04H 13/00 (2013.01); D06N 7/0097 (2013.01); D06N 2201/0254 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29711576 U1 19970911; EP 0888883 A2 19990107; EP 0888883 A3 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031011

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011105

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI