Global Patent Index - EP 0888903 B1

EP 0888903 B1 2001-01-03 - Image-receptor sheet containing a foam layer for an image-recording process

Title (en)

Image-receptor sheet containing a foam layer for an image-recording process

Title (de)

Bildempfangsblatt, das eine Schaumschicht enthält, für ein Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Feuille réceptrice d'images contenant une couche en mousse pour un procédé d'enregistrement

Publication

EP 0888903 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98112034 A

Priority

DE 19728093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888903A2] Image carrier with a base layer has a foam layer of radiation-cured surfactant foam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/382 (2006.01); B41M 5/42 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); B41M 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/42 (2013.01); B41M 5/423 (2013.01); B41M 5/44 (2013.01); B41M 2205/02 (2013.01); B41M 2205/12 (2013.01); B41M 2205/32 (2013.01); B41M 2205/38 (2013.01); Y10S 428/913 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31587 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31786 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0888903 A2 19990107; EP 0888903 A3 19990811; EP 0888903 B1 20010103; DE 19728093 A1 19990107; DE 19728093 C2 19990624; JP 3895871 B2 20070322; JP H1170744 A 19990316; US 6156420 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800417

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150101

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHOELLER TECHNOCELL GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FELIX SCHOELLER JR. FOTO- UND SPEZIALPAPIERE GMBH & CO KG, 49086 OSNABRUECK, DE

- Document: DE 59800417

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59800417

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-06-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59800417

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FELIX *SCHOELLER JR FOTO- UND SPEZIALPAPIERE G.M.B

- Effective date: 20110630

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100611

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100615

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800417 20010208

2001-01-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-01-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-04-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI