Global patent index - EP 0888947 A3

EP 0888947 A3 2000-04-26 - Cover arrangement for waggon

Title (en)

Cover arrangement for waggon

Title (de)

Abdeckanorndung für Güterwagen

Title (fr)

Assemblage de capot pour wagon de marchandises

Publication

EP 0888947 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98850091 A

Priority

SE 9702071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888947A2] The invention concerns a cover arrangement for covering a waggon, said arrangement comprising two rigid end walls (13, 14), which are attachable to the waggon (1) at either end thereof, a cover (15) and a plurality of rigid cover arches (17). Each cover arch extends between the long sides of the waggon and has at its ends end pieces (35), which are displaceably connectible to the waggon for displacement of the cover arch along the waggon. The cover arches are connected to the cover at a distance from each other to form a covered space under the cover. The end walls comprise locking means (21, 23) for releasable locking of two end arches (25, 27) of the cover arches in engagement with an end wall each. The arrangement further comprises members (19) which are arranged between the cover arches and adapted to extend the cover cloth between the arches, each member being elongate, arcuate and resilient. Each member is, when the cover arrangement is arranged on a waggon, pretensioned by elastic bending of at least part of the member, such that it applies an outwardly directed pretensioning force on the cover cloth, at least when the end arches are locked. As a result, the members assist in extending the cover cloth as the arches are moved together. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 39/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0888947 A2 19990107; EP 0888947 A3 20000426; SE 514857 C2 20010507; SE 9702071 D0 19970602; SE 9702071 L 19981203

INPADOC legal status

2001-10-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-02-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI