Global Patent Index - EP 0888963 A3

EP 0888963 A3 2000-01-05 - Sailing harness

Title (en)

Sailing harness

Title (de)

Trapez für das Segeln

Title (fr)

Harnais pour la voile

Publication

EP 0888963 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98305264 A

Priority

DE 29711757 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888963A2] A hooked spreader bar (17) is held to a sailor's body by straps (18) at each end (only one end is shown in the Figure). The straps (18) are formed with serrations (19) that are engaged by noses (22) of pivotable locks (20). When the straps (18) are tight, the locks (20) prevent the straps (18) from loosening but provide a quick-release operation when pressed down at (A). The spreader bar (17) thus is reliably held to a sailor's body and can simply be fitted and removed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 9/10; A62B 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 35/00 (2006.01); B63B 35/79 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 35/7993 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29711757 U1 19971009; EP 0888963 A2 19990107; EP 0888963 A3 20000105

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030410

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020704

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63H 9/10 A, 7A 62B 35/00 B, 7B 63B 35/79 -, 7A 62B 35/00 -

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990512

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI