Global Patent Index - EP 0888977 B1

EP 0888977 B1 2001-12-12 - Spraying device

Title (en)

Spraying device

Title (de)

Sprühvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Pulvérisateur

Publication

EP 0888977 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98111138 A

Priority

DE 19726583 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888977A2] The equipment comprises a vessel with outlet nozzle and containing a partly-liquefied gas mixture under pressure. A cap (5) on the nozzle has an outlet port (9) through which the nozzle discharges. The cap and mixture can also be used for drain-cleaning and local refrigeration if desired, and for blowing passages clear. The cap can be so shaped as to fit against an opening, particularly the drain from a wash basin and along an annular surface, so that no gas can escape sideways.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/14 (2006.01); B65D 83/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/72 (2013.01); B65D 83/20 (2013.01); B65D 83/303 (2013.01); B65D 83/34 (2013.01); B65D 83/752 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726583 A1 19981224; AT 210583 T 20011215; EP 0888977 A2 19990107; EP 0888977 A3 19990506; EP 0888977 B1 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050617

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040617

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-06-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040617

2003-07-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030624

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030526

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802399 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210583 T 20011215

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991103

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI