Global Patent Index - EP 0889137 B1

EP 0889137 B1 2001-05-23 - Fixture for supporting the part being treated, particularly for hide beveling machines and the like

Title (en)

Fixture for supporting the part being treated, particularly for hide beveling machines and the like

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Tragen eines behandelten Teiles, insbesondere für Hautabfasungsmaschinen und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour supporter une pièce traitée, en particulier pour des machines à chanfreiner les peaux et similaires

Publication

EP 0889137 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98104122 A

Priority

IT MI971579 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889137A2] A fixture for supporting a part being treated, particularly for machines for beveling hides and the like, comprising a roller (2) for moving a part (3) being treated below a shoe (5) which is arranged in front of a cup-shaped blade (4) and a front movable guide (10) which is laterally adjacent to the shoe (5) in the travel direction of the part (3) being treated. The fixture further comprises a lateral movable guide (20) which is arranged laterally adjacent to the shoe (5) and ends substantially flush with the cup-shaped blade (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0889137 A2 19990107; EP 0889137 A3 19990630; EP 0889137 B1 20010523; BR 9802313 A 19991103; DE 69800821 D1 20010628; DE 69800821 T2 20010906; ES 2157621 T3 20010816; IT 1292467 B1 19990208; IT MI971579 A1 19990104; IT MI971579 D0 19970703

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090309

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070310

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070310

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080317

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070309

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070309

2006-05-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060511

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157621 T3

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800821 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19991124;SI PAYMENT 19991124

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-03-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-03-08 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19991124;SI PAYMENT 19991124

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991124

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI