Global Patent Index - EP 0889168 A3

EP 0889168 A3 2000-03-01 - Process for making a prepreg, and use of the same for making decorative laminates

Title (en)

Process for making a prepreg, and use of the same for making decorative laminates

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Vorimprägnats und dessen Verwendung zur Herstellung von Dekorverbundgebilden

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de préimprégnés, et utilisation de ceux-ci pour faire des laminés décoratifs

Publication

EP 0889168 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107656 A

Priority

DE 19728250 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889168A2] A process for the production of pre-impregnates (prepregs) comprises impregnating base paper with a liquid containing (a) an aqueous dispersion based on an acrylate ester/styrene copolymer (CP1), (b) a dry-strengthener based on a copolymer (CP2) of (meth)acrylamide and (meth)acrylic acid, and (c) water, using 0.3-13 pts. wt. dry CP1 per 1 pt. wt. dry CP2. Also claimed are (i) prepregs obtained by this process and (ii) an impregnating liquid as above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 27/26; B32B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 17/37 (2006.01); B44C 5/04 (2006.01); D21H 17/35 (2006.01); D21H 27/26 (2006.01); D21H 17/43 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/26 (2013.01); B44C 5/043 (2013.01); D21H 17/35 (2013.01); D21H 17/375 (2013.01); D21H 17/43 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31725 (2015.04); Y10T 428/3188 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31902 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31906 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0889168 A2 19990107; EP 0889168 A3 20000301; EP 0889168 B1 20050629; BR 9802621 A 19991228; BR 9802621 B1 20081118; CA 2240011 A1 19990102; CA 2240011 C 20060919; CZ 292989 B6 20040114; CZ 9801454 A3 19990113; DE 19758479 A1 19990107; DE 19758479 C2 20020711; PL 196113 B1 20071231; PL 327120 A1 19990104; US 6113987 A 20000905; US 6312827 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060330

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050629

2005-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE

2005-06-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030612

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB IT SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI