Global Patent Index - EP 0889236 A3

EP 0889236 A3 2000-04-12 - Air cooled air compressor aftercooler

Title (en)

Air cooled air compressor aftercooler

Title (de)

Nachkühler für luftgekühlten Luftverdichter

Title (fr)

Postrefroidisseur pour compresseur refroidi par air

Publication

EP 0889236 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98107243 A

Priority

US 88661497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889236A2] An air compressor and aftercooler combination in which the aftercooler is located in front of the air compressor. The aftercooler is connected to the air compressor for receiving hot, high pressure air and for effectively cooling the same such that the temperature of the high pressure air delivered by the aftercooler approaches that of atmospheric ambient. A fan is located to draw and direct atmospheric ambient air to the compressor and to and through aftercooler for effective cooling of the high pressure air in the aftercooler, as received from the compressor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 39/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/06 (2006.01); F04B 41/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0889236 A2 19990107; EP 0889236 A3 20000412; AU 6354798 A 19990114; AU 733456 B2 20010517; BR 9801599 A 19990525; CA 2231744 A1 19990101; CA 2231744 C 20041214; JP H1172083 A 19990316; ZA 9804082 B 19981120

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040122

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000708

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI