Global Patent Index - EP 0889240 B1

EP 0889240 B1 2003-06-11 - Screw rotor pump

Title (en)

Screw rotor pump

Title (de)

Schraubenspindelpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à rotors à vis

Publication

EP 0889240 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98112452 A

Priority

DE 19728744 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889240A1] The helical auger pump has a casing supporting a drive spindle with a at least one running spindle. This has one end between a pin shaped support and an annular seal in a positionally fixed bearing recess. Between the running spindle (18) and the pump casing (10) is an aligning pin (26). The pin is mounted within the casing on a support ball (44). The synchronising pin (26) is sealed to the suction volume by seals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 15/00; F04C 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/0042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728744 C1 19981126; EP 0889240 A1 19990107; EP 0889240 B1 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808673

2015-06-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808673

- Representative's name: MURGITROYD & COMPANY, DE

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALLWEILER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALLWEILER AG, 78315 RADOLFZELL, DE

- Document: DE 59808673

- Effective date: 20120405

2012-05-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808673

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BEHRMANN WAGNER PARTNERSCHAFTSG, DE

- Effective date: 20120413

2012-05-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808673

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BEHRMANN WAGNER PARTNERSCHAFTSG, DE

- Effective date: 20120405

2012-05-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808673

- Representative's name: MURGITROYD & COMPANY, DE

- Effective date: 20120413

2012-05-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808673

- Representative's name: MURGITROYD & COMPANY, DE

- Effective date: 20120405

2012-04-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808673

- Representative's name: BEHRMANN WAGNER VOETSCH, DE

2012-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808673

- Representative's name: BEHRMANN WAGNER VOETSCH, DE

2005-07-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050706

2004-06-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-12-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-09-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808673 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

1999-09-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990203

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI