Global patent index - EP 0889284 A3

EP 0889284 A3 2000-12-20 - Vehicle light

Title (en)

Vehicle light

Title (de)

Leuchte für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Lampe pour véhicule

Publication

EP 0889284 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98110622 A

Priority

DE 19727982 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889284A2] The lamp unit has a light source (10) enclosed by a rear reflector (1), fitted with a lamp glass across its front opening. The reflector and the lamp glass have parallel ridges (11,2). The reflector has a parabolic reflection surface (7) and a reflection surface (8) which is flat in the horizontal direction and parabolic in the vertical direction. One or both of these reflector surfaces are provided with convex cylindrical ridges parallel to the lamp glass ridges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21Q 1/00; F21S 8/10; F21V 13/04; F21W 101/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0889284 A2 19990107; EP 0889284 A3 20001220; EP 0889284 B1 20060927; DE 19727982 A1 19990107; DE 59813740 D1 20061109

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150227

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070628

2007-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59813740

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-11-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21S 8/10 20060101AFI20060331BHEP

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21V 13/04 20060101ALI20060331BHEP

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21W 101/12 20060101ALI20060331BHEP

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010420

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21Q 1/00 A, 7F 21S 8/10 B, 7F 21V 13/04 B, 7F 21W 101/12 B

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI