Global Patent Index - EP 0889292 B1

EP 0889292 B1 2001-12-19 - Heat exchanger and central heating boiler comprising such heat exchanger

Title (en)

Heat exchanger and central heating boiler comprising such heat exchanger

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher und Zentralheizungskessel mit so einem Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur et chaudière pour chauffage central avec un tel échangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 0889292 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98202218 A

Priority

NL 1006456 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889292A1] Heat exchanger (1) intended for a central heating boiler, which heat exchanger is designed as a monocasting from substantially aluminum, the heat exchanger comprising a number of walls (2,3,4), which walls bound on one side a water-carrying channel (5) and on the other a burner space (6) and at least two parallel flue gas drafts (7,8), which flue gas drafts (7,8) extend from the burner space (6), the burner space (6) being intended for accommodating a burner, the walls (2,3,4) which bound the burner space (6) and the flue gas drafts (7,8) being water-cooled in that the water-carrying channel (5) extends therealong, the water-carrying channel (5) being of such design that it can be formed with a single, one-piece core (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/287 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

CR-Remeha "W21c ECO boiler" prospect (02.1996)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0889292 A1 19990107; EP 0889292 B1 20011219; AT 211246 T 20020115; DE 69803010 D1 20020131; DE 69803010 T2 20020718; NL 1006456 C2 19990105

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *REMEHA FABRIEKEN B.V.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020416

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803010 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211246 T 20020115

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000329

1999-09-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981218

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI