Global Patent Index - EP 0889364 B1

EP 0889364 B1 2001-01-10 - Method of treating a support suitable for use in the base of a lithographic printing plate

Title (en)

Method of treating a support suitable for use in the base of a lithographic printing plate

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Behandlung eines Trägers und Verwendung des Trägers in einer lithographischen Druckplatte

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le traitement d'un support à utiliser comme base d'une plaque d'impression lithographique

Publication

EP 0889364 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97202034 A

Priority

EP 97202034 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889364A1] The present invention provides a method for obtaining a base to be used as the base of a lithographic printing plate comprising on a hydrophobic support a hydrophilic layer contiguous to said support containing a non-gelatineous hydrophilic (co)polymer or (co)polymer mixture, characterized in that said hydrophobic support is treated with a plasma treatment with an applied power density during the plasma treatment of at least 70 W min/m<2> before applying to said support said hydrophilic layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03F 7/11; B41N 1/08; B41N 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/09 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); B41N 3/03 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/032 (2013.01); B41N 1/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0889364 A1 19990107; EP 0889364 B1 20010110; DE 69703879 D1 20010215; DE 69703879 T2 20010802; JP H1134526 A 19990209

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040704

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040704

2003-06-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030620

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030620

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030619

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703879 20010215

2001-02-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2001-01-10 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990803

1999-09-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990707

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB