Global Patent Index - EP 0889444 A3

EP 0889444 A3 2001-05-16 - Device for identifying persons or animals participating in sporting events

Title (en)

Device for identifying persons or animals participating in sporting events

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Identifizierung von an sportlichen Wettbewerben teilnehmenden Personen oder Tieren

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour identifier des personnes ou des animaux participant aux concours sportifs

Publication

EP 0889444 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98108877 A

Priority

DE 19727930 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889444A2] The identification system is in the form of a receiver that has two coils (10,12) within a common plane (18). The coils both act as transmitters that handle the same signals and have axes (14,16) that produce field lines (24). The field strength in the near field of the coils is amplified. At a distance the field lines density is reduced and the transmission signals are attenuated in the distant field.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 1/26; G07C 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 1/24 (2006.01); G07C 1/26 (2006.01); H01Q 1/22 (2006.01); H01Q 7/00 (2006.01); H01Q 21/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/2216 (2013.01); G07C 1/24 (2013.01); G07C 1/26 (2013.01); H01Q 1/22 (2013.01); H01Q 7/00 (2013.01); H01Q 21/29 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0889444 A2 19990107; EP 0889444 A3 20010516; DE 19727930 A1 19990107; DE 19727930 B4 20040527

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050313

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI