Global Patent Index - EP 0889445 A3

EP 0889445 A3 2001-05-16 - Method for identifying persons or animals participating in sporting events

Title (en)

Method for identifying persons or animals participating in sporting events

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Identifizierung von an sportlichen Wettbewerben teilnehmenden Personen oder Tieren

Title (fr)

Procédé pour identifier des personnes ou des animaux participant aux concours sportifs

Publication

EP 0889445 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98108878 A

Priority

DE 19724560 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889445A2] The identification of individuals or animals in a competition is made using a transponder that has a read write memory in which identification information is contained . The identification number can be read and is modified and entered into the memory and can also be registered. A further section provides a copy of the number in a read only memory.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 1/26; G07C 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 1/24 (2006.01); G07C 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 1/24 (2013.01); G07C 1/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19724560 A1 19981217; EP 0889445 A2 19990107; EP 0889445 A3 20010516; EP 0889445 B1 20050323

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090515

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090515

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STOBBE ANATOLI

- Effective date: 20090531

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051227

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812670 P 20050428

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2005-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020328

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB NL

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010922

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI