Global Patent Index - EP 0889457 B1

EP 0889457 B1 2001-04-11 - Illuminated display panel

Title (en)

Illuminated display panel

Title (de)

Beleuchtete Anzeigetafel

Title (fr)

"Panneau d'affichage lumineux"

Publication

EP 0889457 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401636 A

Priority

FR 9708505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889457A1] The illuminated display panel comprises an opaque base (4) which has a front surface of a dark colour with a number of light sources, for exampleAllnGap technology diodes, mounted on the surface. These diodes are covered by a front optical filter having a neutral absorption, and with a transmission coefficient of between 10 and 60% over the whole visible light spectrum. The panel does not have any other filter. The transmission coefficient may be more closely defined at between 12 and 40%, offering a brown colour. The base of the panel may be black, and the led's may be chosen to transmit a principle wavelength of between 500 and 650 nm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 9/33

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/33 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/33 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0889457 A1 19990107; EP 0889457 B1 20010411; DE 69800682 D1 20010517; DE 69800682 T2 20011122; ES 2157646 T3 20010816; FR 2765712 A1 19990108; FR 2765712 B1 19990917; PT 889457 E 20010928; US 6118210 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040706

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070702

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. D'EXPLOITATION DU MOBILIER A USAGE PUBLIC *SE

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-07-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060717

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2004-08-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040802

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-06 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040706

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040624

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-09-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020919

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020906

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157646 T3

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800682 20010517

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB NL PT

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000825

1999-09-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB NL PT

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990625

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB NL PT

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI