Global Patent Index - EP 0889544 A3

EP 0889544 A3 2000-03-22 - Electrical thin wire connection

Title (en)

Electrical thin wire connection

Title (de)

Elektrische Kontaktierung von Feinstdrähten

Title (fr)

Connexion électrique de fils mince

Publication

EP 0889544 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98109731 A

Priority

DE 19727973 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889544A2] The contact is in the form of a piece of thin sheet material that is folded into an U-shaped section (1) into which the wire (5) is inserted. The wire is clamped into contact with the U-shaped section and is in electrical contact with at least one side of the U-shaped section. The section at the centre (4) has to be separated to insert the wire and when released the spring action maintains good contact with the wire.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24; H01R 4/02; H01R 4/10; H01R 4/12; H01R 4/28; H01R 43/02; H01R 43/04; H04R 9/02; H04R 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 4/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2013.01); H01R 4/2495 (2013.01); H01R 4/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0889544 A2 19990107; EP 0889544 A3 20000322; EP 0889544 B1 20030827; AT 248445 T 20030915; DE 19727973 A1 19990107; DK 0889544 T3 20040816; US 6210241 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-02-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-01-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060509

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-08-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809382

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-09-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR GB IE

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ELECTRICAL THIN WIRE CONNECTION, WITH A NOMINAL DIAMETER OF 100 MICROMETRES OR LESS

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE DK FR GB IE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 4/24 A, 7H 01R 4/28 B, 7H 04R 9/04 B, 7H 04R 9/02 B, 7H 01R 4/10 B, 7H 01R 4/12 B, 7H 01R 43/04 B, 7H 01R 43/02 B, 7H 01R 4/02 B

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR GB IE

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI