Global Patent Index - EP 0889550 A3

EP 0889550 A3 2000-01-05 - Covering for terminals with a protective cover

Title (en)

Covering for terminals with a protective cover

Title (de)

Klemmenabdeckung mit Schutzabdeckung

Title (fr)

Recouvrement pour bornes avec une couverture de protection

Publication

EP 0889550 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111456 A

Priority

DE 19728716 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889550A2] A terminal cover with a tubular housing into which is inserted a box terminal for connecting an electric conductor and which is provided at its front face with a protective cover, which serves as shock-hazard protection relative to the conductors, and where several terminal connections for connection of the electrical conductors are provided with different spacings from the top of the housing. The protective cover is displaceable for matching the terminal connections used to the connection point. The protective cover is specifically latchable relative to the terminal cover at different positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/44; H01R 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/02 (2006.01); H01R 13/447 (2006.01); H01R 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0264 (2013.01); H01R 13/447 (2013.01); H01H 2011/0037 (2013.01); H01R 9/2408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728716 C1 19981126; DE 59813741 D1 20061109; EP 0889550 A2 19990107; EP 0889550 A3 20000105; EP 0889550 B1 20060927

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160615

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130622

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070628

2007-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59813741

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-11-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060927

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 9/26 A, 7H 01R 13/447 B, 7H 01H 9/02 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI