Global Patent Index - EP 0889558 B1

EP 0889558 B1 2002-12-18 - Plug part of an electric plug connector for high frequency data transmission over electrical conductors

Title (en)

Plug part of an electric plug connector for high frequency data transmission over electrical conductors

Title (de)

Steckverbindungsteil für hochfrequente Datenübertragung über elektrische Leiter

Title (fr)

Partie de connecteur électrique à fiches pour la transmission de données a hautefréquence sur des conducteurs électriques

Publication

EP 0889558 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98109325 A

Priority

CH 130397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0889558A2] The contact plug or socket is formed with a series of parallel conductors each with connection and contact points at the ends. At one end are a number of blade connections Ä12Ü that receive the ends of wires. The other ends are formed with contact springs (21,22) that are formed by bending over the ends. This arrangement compensates for capacitive and inductive coupling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6467 (2011.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 24/64 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6467 (2013.01); H01R 24/64 (2013.01); Y10S 439/941 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0889558 A2 19990107; EP 0889558 A3 19991117; EP 0889558 B1 20021218; AT 230169 T 20030115; CH 693012 A5 20030115; DE 59806682 D1 20030130; US 6099357 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150522

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150522

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150522

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150522

2016-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 230169 T

- Effective date: 20150522

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806682

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806682

- Representative's name: DAUB UND KOLLEGEN, DE

2012-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806682

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSKANZLEI DAUB, DE

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806682 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806682 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230169 T 20030115

2002-12-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 24/00 A

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-07-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000517

1999-11-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6H 01R 23/02 A, 6H 01R 23/00 B

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1999-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI